Kentner, Taryn Alexandra (CPSO#: 88453)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone: (519)941-2410
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Taryn Kentner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kentner ( CPSO# 88453 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-0630

Business Address:
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone Number: (807) 737-3030

Business Address:
Headwaters Healthcare Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Business Address:
TBRHSC
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARYN ALEXANDRA KENTNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENTNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2010