Kents, Kersti Erika (CPSO#: 79249)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Nov 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone: (705) 645-4400
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

74 Cedar Pointe Drive, #1005
Barrie ON  L4N 5R7
Canada
Phone: (705) 721-7775
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

345 Ecclestone Drive
Bracebridge ON  P1L 1R1
Canada
Phone: 7056370777
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K.E. Kents Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kents ( CPSO# 79249 )

Business Address:
74 Cedar Point Drive
Suite 1005
Barrie ON  L4N 5R7

Business Address:
345 Ecclestone Drive
Bracebridge ON  P1L 1R1
Phone Number: (705) 637-0777

Business Address:
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone Number: (705) 645-4404

Business Address:
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone Number: (705) 789-2311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KERSTI ERIKA KENTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENTS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2005