Kenyon, Gregory James (CPSO#: 58163)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
179 Ontario Road
Box 10
Mitchell ON  N0K 1N0
Phone: (519) 348-8797
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY JAMES KENYON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENYON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1988