Keohane, John Daniel (CPSO#: 57294)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 08 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 1991