Ker, Katherine Juanita (CPSO#: 91183)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
North York General Hospital
4 South
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6980
Fax: (416) 756-6979
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Katherine Ker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ker ( CPSO# 91183 )

Business Address:
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
North York General Hospital
4 South
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6980

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE JUANITA KER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 02 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011