Keren, Arieh Eric (CPSO#: 88078)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 01 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Melbourne, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Keren Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 20 2012

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 25 Feb 2008 to 25 Mar 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2008 to 24 Feb 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 25 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2012