Keresteci, Ara Kapriel (CPSO#: 18532)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English, Turkish

Education:Istanbul University, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Nov 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1957
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1962
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006