Kerr, Andrea Elaine (CPSO#: 69327)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: Perks, Andrea Elaine (used until: 24 Mar 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 1999