Kerr, Donald Robert (CPSO#: 66873)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
204-801 Mohawk Road West
Hamilton ON  L9C 6C2
Phone: (905) 388-3541
Fax: (905) 388-0477
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Robert Kerr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kerr ( CPSO# 66873 )

Business Address:
204 - 801 Mohawk Road West
Hamilton ON  L9C 6C2
Phone Number: (905) 388-3541

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD ROBERT KERR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KERR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995