Kerr, Ian Graham (CPSO#: 29931)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 May 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
London Regional Cancer Program
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN GRAHAM KERR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KERR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Aug 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1982