Kerr-Cresswell, Danielle (CPSO#: 69786)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 28 Feb 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 28 Feb 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008