Kertesz, Daniel Andrew (CPSO#: 59676)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Oct 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 02 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL ANDREW KERTESZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KERTESZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1995