Kesarwani, Atul (CPSO#: 50955)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 May 1987

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 214
10 York Mills Road
Toronto ON  M2P 2G4
Phone: (416) 449-9983
Fax: (416) 449-4578
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 469-6580
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Albany Medical Clinic
897 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kesarwani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 3 2007


Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010


Corporation Name: Kesarwani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kesarwani ( CPSO# 50955 )

Business Address:
10 York Mills Road
Suite 214
Toronto ON  M2P 2G4
Phone Number: (416) 449-9983

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ATUL KESARWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KESARWANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 1987

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Kesarwani’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Kesarwani engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in that he relocated and operated an Out-of-Hospital premise without receiving College approval and he misled the College as to the above.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): January 4-5, 2018