Keshavjee, Al-Noor Muradalli (CPSO#: 71581)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milliken Medical Centre
Suite 17
5671 Steeles Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1V 5P6
Phone: (416) 291-6323
Fax: (416) 291-0890
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1450 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1C1
Canada
Phone: (905) 831-8333
Fax: (905) 831-8858
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AL-NOOR MURADALLI KESHAVJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KESHAVJEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1999