Keshavjee, Karim (CPSO#: 66526)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Nov 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1995
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2006
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 20 Jul 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 20 Jul 2015 Active View Details [+]

            As from July 20, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Karim Keshavjee, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Keshavjee to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Karim Keshavjee has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
                  jurisdictions.
                  
                  
            As from November 8, 2006, and as amended June 2010, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Karim Keshavjee, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by
            Dr. Keshavjee to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario: 

                  Dr. Karim Keshavjee has voluntarily relinquished his prescribing
                  privileges with respect to all drugs, substances and preparations set out
                  in Schedules I through IV of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act,
                  S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended, and related regulations.