Keshavjee, Shafique (CPSO#: 55704)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
Room 9N 946
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4010
Fax: (416) 340-4556
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shaf Keshavjee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Keshavjee ( CPSO# 55704 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Suite 9N-946
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 12 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 01 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAFIQUE KESHAVJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KESHAVJEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Research Fellows - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 31 Mar 1988
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1986