Keshavjee, Yasmin (CPSO#: 65149)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Nov 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Erie-St Clair Clinic
1574 Lincoln Rd
Windsor ON  N8Y 2J4
Phone: (519) 977-9772
Fax: (519) 977-7145
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

500 Wyandotte st E
Windsor ON  N9A3H9
Canada
Phone: 519-254-3300
Fax: 519-254-3305
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASMIN KESHAVJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KESHAVJEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Sep 1993
Other - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1993