Kessaram, Robert Anoop (CPSO#: 27052)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Avenue Medical Center, 221 Brant Avenue, Brantford, ON N3T 3J3
Date Received: 18 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 2015