Kesten, Steven (CPSO#: 52603)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: Kestenbaum, Steven (used until: 07 Jan 1988 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 1996