Kestenbaum, Deborah Susan (CPSO#: 62302)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
2401 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone: (416) 485-2222
Fax: (416) 485-2276
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bay Centre for Birth control
WCH
76 Grenville St.
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 351-3700
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah Kestenbaum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kestenbaum ( CPSO# 62302 )

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 351-3700

Business Address:
204 - 2401 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone Number: (416) 485-2222

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH SUSAN KESTENBAUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KESTENBAUM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991