Keszthelyi, Eniko Judith (CPSO#: 80873)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Columbian Hospital
Hospitalist Office
330 Columbia Street East
New Westminster BC  V3L 3W7
Phone: (604) 520-4001
Fax: (604) 520-4069

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ENIKO JUDITH KESZTHELYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KESZTHELYI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 May 2004 to 11 Jun 2004
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2016