Kettle, Charles Alfred (CPSO#: 60929)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1493 Paris Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3B7
Phone: (705) 673-5035
Fax: (705) 673-5931
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles Kettle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kettle ( CPSO# 60929 )

Business Address:
1493 Paris Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3B7
Phone Number: (705) 673-5035

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 28 Aug 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES ALFRED KETTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KETTLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1990