Kettles, Mary Jane (CPSO#: 30125)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272 Ext. 6212
Fax: (416) 469-6874
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kettles Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kettles ( CPSO# 30125 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY JANE KETTLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KETTLES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1984