Kevu, Joseph Erinyunja (CPSO#: 83879)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Benin, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH ERINYUNJA KEVU may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. KEVU is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. KEVU shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KEVU is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. KEVU shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. KEVU ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. KEVU ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 06 Dec 2005 to 12 Jan 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 13 Jan 2006 to 03 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jan 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017