Keymer, Marjorie Elizabeth (CPSO#: 24075)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Virginia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2017