Keystone, Edward Clark (CPSO#: 22899)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
2nd Floor
Room 2-005
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-8847
Fax: (416) 586-8766
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edward C. Keystone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Keystone ( CPSO# 22899 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 2-006
Box 4
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-8646

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 20 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD CLARK KEYSTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEYSTONE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1970