Keystone, Jay Stephen (CPSO#: 22911)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
13N-1347
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3675
Fax: (416) 340-3260
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medisys Travel Health
suite 1500
333Bay St
Toronto ON  M5H 2R2
Canada
Phone: (416) 926-2698
Fax: (416) 362-2018
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

284 Earl St unit 8400
Kingston ON  K7L2H8
Canada
Phone: 613-507-7775
Fax: 613-507-7773
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jay Keystone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Keystone ( CPSO# 22911 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
13N-1347
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3671

Business Address:
Suite 1500
333 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5H 2R2
Phone Number: (416) 926-2698

Business Address:
Suite B400
284 Earl Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2H8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 09 Apr 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAY STEPHEN KEYSTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEYSTONE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1970