Khabiry, Mohammad-Ali (CPSO#: 66546)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southern California Permanente
Medical Group
Radiology Department
6650 Alton Pkwy Irvine, CA
irvine CA  92612
United States
Phone: (949) 932-2175

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD-ALI KHABIRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHABIRY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998