Khachatryan, Davit (CPSO#: 97653)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English, Russian

Education:Yerevan State Medical University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905)-576-8711
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Khachatryan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Khachatryan ( CPSO# 97653 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 550-3313

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Aug 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVIT KHACHATRYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHACHATRYAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2017