Khadawardi, Hadeel Abdulrahman A (CPSO#: 100054)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 416-946-0904
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HADEEL ABDULRAHMAN A KHADAWARDI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KHADAWARDI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. KHADAWARDI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KHADAWARDI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. KHADAWARDI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KHADAWARDI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KHADAWARDI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018