Khairallah, Eric William (CPSO#: 64616)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:American University of Beirut, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 29 Aug 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998