Khakee, Shamshuddin Gulamali (CPSO#: 44852)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Welsh National School of Medicine, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 1995