Khalaff Abourawi, Hussein Musbah (CPSO#: 55154)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 111
700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Phone: (519) 971-0083
Fax: (519) 971-0659
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hussein Khalaff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Khalaff Abourawi ( CPSO# 55154 )

Business Address:
111 - 700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Phone Number: (519) 971-0083

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUSSEIN MUSBAH KHALAFF ABOURAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALAFF ABOURAWI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1985 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 14 Apr 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 21 Apr 1994
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2001