Khalameizer, Vladimir (CPSO#: 80504)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tashkent Pediatric Medical Institute, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Feb 2004 to 18 May 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 19 May 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 20 May 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 May 2005