Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Khaled, Mohamed Bahaa (CPSO#: 59465)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
Second Floor
4145 North Service Road
Burlington ON  L7L 6A3
Phone: (905) 464-1364
Fax: (905) 333-4131
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MB Khaled Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khaled ( CPSO# 59465 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
4145 North Service Road
Burlington ON  L7L 6A3
Phone Number: (905) 464-1364

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED BAHAA KHALED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALED is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1989