Khalidi, Nader Amir (CPSO#: 62678)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Nov 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Charlton Ave East
Suite 708
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 521-9034
Fax: (905) 521-8099
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: (905) 521-8099
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 12 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADER AMIR KHALIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIDI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1991