Khalifa, Abubaker (CPSO#: 101040)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mcmaster University
Department Of Anesthesia
Room 2V9
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75180
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mcmaster University Medical Centre
Room 2V9
1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abubaker Khalifa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khalifa ( CPSO# 101040)

Business Address:
McMaster University
Department of Anesthesia
1280 Main Street West
Room 2V9
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABUBAKER KHALIFA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIFA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2017