Khalifa, Amer Jawzie (CPSO#: 63282)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
Pasqua Hospital
4101 Dewdney Avenue
Regina SK  S4T 1A5
Phone: (306) 766-2156

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMER JAWZIE KHALIFA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIFA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1990 to 31 Jan 1991
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 31 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 May 1993
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1997