Khalifa, Mohamed Mohamed (CPSO#: 56044)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Sep 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3968 March Creek Ln
Akron OH  44272
United States
Phone: (330) 6873923

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Genetics Effective: 21 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED MOHAMED KHALIFA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIFA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1992