Khalifah, Nezar Mohammed (CPSO#: 78262)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neuroanaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neuroanaesthesia

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005