Khalil, Ali (CPSO#: 50957)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 May 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1988


Former Name: Khalil, Aly (used until: 15 Sep 1985 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Aix-Marseille II, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Arab Emirates


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ALI KHALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 May 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1988