Khalil, Diana Emad (CPSO#: 105238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Arts Building
Department of Otolaryngology
581 Davis Drive
Suite 104
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: 905-898-2444
Fax: 905-898-5558
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Diana E. Khalil Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Khalil ( CPSO# 105238)

Business Address:
1 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 8L4
Phone Number: (519) 624-8877

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANA EMAD KHALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2015 to 17 Jan 2015
Elective Trainee - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 01 Jan 2018
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2016