Khalil, Moosa Nathan Gindy (CPSO#: 67407)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Asyut University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
McCaig Tower, Room 7555
Foothills Medical Centre
1403 29th Street North West
Calgary AB  T2N 2T9
Phone: (403) 944-8369
Fax: (403) 944-4748

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 31 Jul 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOOSA NATHAN GINDY KHALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Aug 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Jul 1997
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1997