Khalil, Muhammad Arshad Khan (CPSO#: 32583)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Mar 1987

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2224 Walker Road
Suite 120
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone: (519) 977-7880
Fax: (519) 977-0094
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

6124 tecumseh rd east
Windsor ON  N8T 1E6
Canada
Phone: 519 915 9494
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. K. Khalil Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khalil ( CPSO# 32583 )

Business Address:
6124 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8T 1E6
Phone Number: (519) 915-9494

Business Address:
120 - 2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone Number: (519) 977-7880

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  June 12, 2013
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On June 18, 2013, Windsor Regional Hospital notified the College that Dr. Khalil's privileges were restricted, effective June 12, 2013.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 29 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD ARSHAD KHAN KHALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1981
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Nov 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1987