Khalili, Ali (CPSO#: 61430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1990


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Persian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
imperial college London
diabetic center
P O Box 48338
Abu Dhabi 48338
United Arab Emirates
Phone: 9712-4040922
Fax: 9712-4040900

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Arab Emirates


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ALI KHALILI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALILI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1990