Khamsi, Firouz (CPSO#: 21493)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Mar 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Iranian, Persian

Education:University of Birmingham, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 1971
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 07 May 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Mar 2011

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 16, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Firouz Khamsi, to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

I, Dr. Firouz Khamsi:

(1) Hereby resign from the College, effective immediately.
(2) Hereby undertake never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
(3) Consent to the terms of this Undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.
(4) Acknowledge that, in exchange for this Undertaking, the College agrees not to proceed with a discipline referral of allegations, as set out in the Notice of Hearing dated April 7, 2010, that I committed an act of professional misconduct. In particular, it is alleged that I am incompetent as defined by subsection 52(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code and that I failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in my care, treatment and record-keeping for twenty-six patients, the identities of whom have been disclosed to me.
(5) Agree that, in the event that the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario should become aware that I have either applied, re-applied for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario shall, in its sole discretion, have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this Undertaking and shall have the right to proceed with the investigation and prosecution of the allegations referred to at paragraph 4.