Khan, Aneal Asher (CPSO#: 73287)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Department of Medical Genetics McMaster Children’s Hospital 1200 Main Street West Hamilton, Ontario L8N 3Z5
Date Received: 28 May 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Mar 1999 to 08 Apr 1999
Elective Trainee - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008