Khan, Arshad (CPSO#: 50959)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Delhi, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: DOCUdavit Solutions Inc 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4
Date Received: 07 Jun 2016


Address: 96 Highland Road W Kitchener ON N2M 3B5 Tel: 519 571 0925
Instructions: Contact Dr. Khan at above address
Date Received: 13 Jan 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2016