Khan, Asifjehan (CPSO#: 84118)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Natal, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6617
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asifjehan Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khan ( CPSO# 84118 )

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 23 Apr 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASIFJEHAN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2006