Khan, Baseer Uddin (CPSO#: 75084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9135 Keele Street
Unit A5
Vaughan ON  L4K0J4
Phone: (416) 663-3937
Fax: (416) 663-3731
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

500 Huronia Rd #204
Barrie ON  L4N 8X3
Canada
Phone: (705) 797-1700
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

200 Fletcher Cresc.,
2nd Floor eye clinic
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Canada
Phone: (416) 663-3937
Fax: (416) 663-3731
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

240 Alton Towers Circle
Suite 300
Scarborough ON  M1V 3Z3
Canada
Phone: (416) 663-3937
Fax: (416) 663-3731
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

350 Rutherford Rd.,S
Suite 300 Plaza 2
Brampton ON  L6W 4N6
Canada
Phone: 416 663 3937
Fax: 416 663 3731
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Baseer U. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Khan ( CPSO# 75084 )

Business Address:
A5 - 9135 Keele Street
Vaughan ON  L4K 0J4

Business Address:
3 - 145 Kingston Road
Ajax ON  L1S 7J4

Business Address:
Suite 300
350 Rutherford Road
Brampton ON  L6W 4N6
Phone Number: (416) 663-3937

Business Address:
300 - 240 Alton Towers Circle
Toronto ON  M1V 3Z3
Phone Number: (416) 663-3937

Business Address:
500 Hurontario Road
Suite 204
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Jamaica

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BASEER UDDIN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005